+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Held in Health & Human Services
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 1, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto