+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On December 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2007
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2007
- Do Pass Higher Education; 006-000-000
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 014-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Higher Education Committee
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. With respect to the Monetary Award Program, provides that the maximum grant amount must not exceed $5,466 (instead of $4,968). Provides that the maximum grant amount for students not subject to this provision must be increased by the same percentage as any increase made by law to such provision. Effective July 1, 2007.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 28, 2007: HB0703 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 28, 2007
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor