+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 005-003-000
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Beginning with the 2022-2023 school year, provides that the Chicago Board of Education shall require the top 20% of the lowest performing schools in the district to employ a school nurse. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/34-81.67 new
- 105 ILCS 5/34-18.67 new