+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (54)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0954
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Karen May
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 038-012-003
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted State Government; 006-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2004
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2004
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2004
- Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000
- Assigned to State Government
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2004
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status Rep. William B. Black
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 3
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-002
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Creates the Procurement of Domestic Products Act. In purchasing contracts awarded by State agencies, including universities, requires a preference for products manufactured in the United States unless (i) they are not available in a reasonable quantity, (ii) they are unreasonably more expensive than foreign made products, (iii) they are of substantially lower quality than foreign made products, or (iv) their purchase is not in the public interest. Requires that bids specify the source of goods. Requires that contracts awarded with the preference contain the contractor's certification as to use of U.S.-made products. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code to make conforming changes.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Procurement of Domestic Products Act. Reinserts the provisions of House Amendment No. 1. Makes changes relating to the definition of "manufactured in the United States", assembled components, disclosure of source of content, prequalification of suppliers, and penalties.
House Floor Amendment No. 3
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Procurement of Domestic Products Act. Reinserts the provisions of House Amendment No. 1. Makes changes relating to the definition of "manufactured in the United States", assembled components, disclosure of source of content, prequalification of suppliers, penalties, and projects exempted by the Capital Development Board.
House Floor Amendment No. 3
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Procurement of Domestic Products Act. Reinserts the provisions of House Amendment No. 1. Makes changes relating to the definition of "manufactured in the United States", assembled components, disclosure of source of content, prequalification of suppliers, penalties, and projects exempted by the Capital Development Board.