+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2016
- Arrive in Senate
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-031-005
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On October 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
On August 31, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015
On July 31, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jack D. Franks
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-000-003
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 15, 2015
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2015 levy year, the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law applies to all non-home rule taxing districts. Provides that, beginning with the 2015 levy year, the extension limitation under the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law is 0% or the rate of increase approved by the voters. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 35 ILCS 5/404 - from Ch. 120, par. 4-404
- 35 ILCS 200/18-185 -
- 35 ILCS 200/18-205 -
- 35 ILCS 200/18-212 -
- 35 ILCS 200/18-213 -
- 35 ILCS 200/18-214 -
- 30 ILCS 805/8.39 new -
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2016: HB0696 - Third Reading
May 12, 2015: HFA0001 - Revenue & Finance - May 12, 2015
April 14, 2015: HB0696 - Executive - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor