+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 11, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0246
- Effective Date January 1, 2010
- Governor Approved
On June 12, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009
- Second Reading
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-001
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Stalking No Contact Order Act. Provides that a petition may be filed for a stalking no contact order when relief is not available to the petitioner under the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986 by a victim of stalking or by a person on behalf of a minor child or an adult who is a victim of stalking but because of age, disability, health, or inaccessibility cannot file the petition. Establishes procedures for seeking a petition and remedies.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2009: HB0693 - Third Reading - Friday, May 15, 2009
April 1, 2009: HB0693 - Wednesday, April 01, 2009
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor