+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On October 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
On August 31, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 120/14 - from Ch. 120, par. 453
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: HB0688 - Executive - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor