+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Human Services
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Government Reform
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Government Reform
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Government Reform
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-000
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Government Transparency Committee; 009-000-000
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Government Transparency Committee
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Government Transparency Committee; 007-000-000
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Government Transparency Committee
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (3)
April 26, 2017: HB0682 - Third Reading
March 30, 2017: HFA0002 - Government Transparency
February 22, 2017: HB0682 - Government Transparency
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor