+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0977
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 20, 2004
- Sent to the Governor
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank Aguilar
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-002
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Patricia Bailey
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Clayborne
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Judiciary; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2004
- Second Reading
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2004
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Sponsor Removed Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lovana Jones
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia Reid Lindner
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Delgado
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia Bailey
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that a person at least 17 years of age at the time of the commission of the offense who is convicted of the offense of first degree murder against a person under 18 years of age must register as a sex offender for natural life. Eliminates the provision that the offense had to have been committed on or after January 1, 1986. Also provides that a person required to register as a sex offender who intends (rather than desires) to establish a residence or employment outside the State of Illinois must inform the law enforcement agency which he or she last registered of his or her out-of-state residence or employment.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that a person at least 17 years of age at the time of the commission of the offense who is convicted of the offense of first degree murder against a person under 18 years of age must register as a sex offender for natural life. Eliminates the provision that the offense had to have been committed on or after January 1, 1986. Also provides that a person required to register as a sex offender who intends (rather than desires) to establish a residence or employment outside the State of Illinois must inform the law enforcement agency which he or she last registered of his or her out-of-state residence or employment.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 730 ILCS 150/2 - from Ch. 38, par. 222
- 730 ILCS 150/6 - from Ch. 38, par. 226