+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 009-002-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin McLaughlin
+ − Statute Amended
- 50 ILCS 510/5 - from Ch. 85, par. 6405