+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 13, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0353
- Effective Date August 13, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009
- Second Reading
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 25, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 8, 2009 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Joseph M. Lyons