+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 30, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0181
- Effective Date July 30, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 036-017-000
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021
- Second Reading
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
- Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2021
- Arrive in Senate
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-029-000
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-002-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 755 ILCS 45/4-6 - from Ch. 110 1/2, par. 804-6
- 755 ILCS 45/4-10 - from Ch. 110 1/2, par. 804-10