+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On November 20, 2004 in the House:
- Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
On November 5, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto November 8, 2004
On August 25, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 30, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 1, 2004 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2004
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; by Voice Vote
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
- Passed Both Houses
On May 18, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Patrick Verschoore
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 008-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2004
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions
On April 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2004
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 19, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 016-000-000
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Verschoore
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Commissioner of Banks and Real Estate must cooperate with the Director of Aging to encourage financial institutions to participate (instead of "ensure that all financial institutions participate") in the financial exploitation of the elderly intervention program.
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 3205/6 - from Ch. 17, par. 456
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2004: SCA0001 - Concurrence - Tuesday, June 01, 2004
May 11, 2004: HB6740 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 11, 2004
March 25, 2004: HB6740 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor