+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 13, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0370
- Effective Date August 13, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-010-000
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009
- Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-033-000
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael K. Smith
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the introduced bill with changes. Deletes a provision that provides for an annual adjustment to reflect changes in the Consumer Price Index in the fee charged to persons and entities that are not residents of a fire protection district for fire protection services. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 70 ILCS 705/11f - from Ch. 127 1/2, par. 31f