+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule April 30, 2007
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) March 31, 2007
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Remains in Revenue Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue Committee; 002-001-000
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook