+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 2, 2004
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 105/2 - from Ch. 127, par. 138
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor