+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Remains in Juvenile Justice Reform Committee
- Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Juvenile Justice Reform Committee; 002-005-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Juvenile Justice Reform Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Juvenile Justice Reform Committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Juvenile Justice Reform Committee
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack McGuire
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes the amendatory changes to the Juvenile Court Act of 1987.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 705 ILCS 405/5-130 -
- 720 ILCS 5/3-6 - from Ch. 38, par. 3-6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor