+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 23, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On May 21, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-052-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Executive Committee
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Makes FY09 appropriations to the Department of Healthcare and Family Services. Effective July 1, 2008.