+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- To Product Safety Subcommittee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
+ − Statute Amended
- 410 ILCS 620/3.15 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 503.15