+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 23, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On May 21, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-051-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Executive Committee
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Makes FY09 appropriations to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, the Illinois Commerce Commission, the Department of Employment Security, the Department of Military Affairs, and the Department of Labor. Effective July 1, 2008.