+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); April 30, 2004
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 2, 2004
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 50 ILCS 110/0.01 - from Ch. 102, par. 4.9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor