+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/27-2 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor