+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Executive Committee
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan