+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 27, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On May 26, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Aging Committee; 008-000-000
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Aging Committee
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31,2004
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Bassi
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Aging Committee
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); April 30, 2004
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Bassi
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Suzanne Bassi
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 2, 2004
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 105/2 - from Ch. 23, par. 6102
+ − Vote
May 26, 2004: HB6354 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 26, 2004
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor