+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 23, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On May 21, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-051-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-007-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Makes FY09 appropriations to the Illinois State Board of Education. Effective July 1, 2008.