+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0533
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 8, 2016
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016
- Second Reading
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.