+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 060-050-000
- Shall the Chair be Sustained
- Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. Ron Stephens
- Motion Discharge Committee Lost by Voice Vote
- Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Rep. Ron Stephens
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Motion Discharge Committee Lost 050-064-000
- Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Rep. William B. Black
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-18 - from Ch. 127, par. 142z-18
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-20 - from Ch. 127, par. 142z-20
- 35 ILCS 105/3-10 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.3-10
- 35 ILCS 110/3-10 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.33-10
- 35 ILCS 115/3-10 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.103-10
- 35 ILCS 120/2-10 - from Ch. 120, par. 441-10
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2008: HB6318 - Tuesday, May 20, 2008
April 9, 2008: HB6318 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 09, 2008
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor