+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
- Motion Prevailed
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Chapin Rose
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 004-002-000
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor