+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robin Kelly
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robin Kelly
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Julie Hamos
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 620/1 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1001