+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 26, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Balanced Budget Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. William B. Black
- Motion Prevailed 077-038-001
- Balanced Budget Note Request is Inapplicable
- Motion Prevailed 098-005-010
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
- Judicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Home Rule Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- State Debt Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- State Mandates Fiscal Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. William B. Black
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Lou Lang
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Lou Lang
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2007: HB0618 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 24, 2007
March 13, 2007: HB0618 - Motion - Tuesday, March 13, 2007
March 13, 2007: HB0618 - Motion - Tuesday, March 13, 2007
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor