+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 29, 2005 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0360
- Effective Date January 1, 2006
- Governor Approved
On June 15, 2005 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2005 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2005
- Second Reading
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2005
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 24, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 014-000-000
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John A. Fritchey