+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (54)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0722
- Effective Date August 5, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 110-007-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Carol Sente
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2016
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2016
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 015-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
- To Subcommittee on Election Law
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-008-000
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Removes language concerning a deputy registrar's ability to preregister to vote. Removes provisions amending the Township Code. Further amends the Election Code. Provides that a person who is 17 years old on the date of a caucus or consolidated primary election and who is other qualified to vote is qualified to vote at that consolidated primary if that person will be 18 years old on the date of the immediately following consolidated election for which candidates are nominated at that primary. Provides that an individual who is 17 years of age, will be 18 years of age on the date of the immediately following general or consolidated election, and is otherwise qualified to vote shall be deemed competent to circulate a nominating petition or a petition proposing a public question. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Further amends the Election Code by adding provisions to Articles of the Election Code concerning registration of electors in counties having a population of less than 500,000 and registration of electors in certain cities, villages, and incorporated towns identical to those in the introduced bill. Makes a grammatical change. Effective immediately.