+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (52)
On August 19, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0841
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 038-019-000
On May 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2016
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Human Services; 006-002-000
- Waive Posting Notice
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-035-000
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 015-004-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Ron Sandack
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ron Sandack
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ron Sandack
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Ron Sandack
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Andrew F Skoog
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Andrew F Skoog
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Andrew F Skoog
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Andrew F Skoog
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
Deletes a short or long-term disability plan from an exclusion from the term "personal sick leave benefits". Removes a reference to rights and remedies under the Act as being cumulative. Provides that employers who have policies that provide the required leave do not have to modify those policies.
House Amendment 001
Adds language providing that the Department of Labor is prohibited from adopting any rules in contravention of the Act. Deletes language providing that the Department shall adopt rules to implement the Act, including, but not limited to, rules to further define employee recourse in cases of violation of the Act.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (5)
May 31, 2016: HB6162 - Third Reading
May 30, 2016: HB6162 - Human Services
May 24, 2016: HB6162 - Third Reading
April 20, 2016: HFA0002 - Labor & Commerce Committee
April 13, 2016: HB6162 - Labor & Commerce Committee
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor