+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On August 5, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0721
- Effective Date August 5, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016
- Second Reading
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016
- Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- Pension Note Filed
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- Correctional Note Filed
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- Judicial Note Filed
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 021-006-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Adds another 2 members to the Advisory Council on At-Risk Students. Provides that the Council's initial report must be submitted by no later than December 15, 2017 (rather than December 15, 2016).
House Amendment 001
Provides that the Speaker and Minority Leader of the House of Representatives shall each appoint a member of the House of Representatives (rather than "member") to the Advisory Council. Provides that the President and Minority Leader of the Senate shall each appoint a member of the Senate (rather than "member") to the Advisory Council. Provides that the report to be prepared by the Advisory Council must address certain questions only with respect to school districts where racial minorities comprise a majority of the student population.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 29, 2016: HB6136 - Third Reading
May 10, 2016: HB6136 - Education
April 20, 2016: HB6136 - Third Reading
April 7, 2016: HB6136 - Elem Sec Ed School Curricu Policies
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor