+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-056-000
- Fiscal Note Filed
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- Correctional Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 009-005-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations to the Racing Board. Effective July 1, 2014.
+ − Vote
May 15, 2014: HB6134 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 15, 2014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor