+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 022-000-000
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor