+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0680
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 1, 2014
On June 27, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 040-017-001
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2014
- Second Reading
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Michael J. Madigan
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 29, 2014
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-048-000
- Verified
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Michael J. Madigan
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 010-007-000
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations and reappropriations to specified agencies. Effective July 1, 2014.