+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 5, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0716
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-002-000
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016
- Second Reading
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016
- Do Pass Human Services; 005-002-000
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-005-000
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katherine Cloonen
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-001-000
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Requires the Department of Human Services to consider the length of time spent on the Prioritization of Urgency of Need for Services waiting list, in addition to other factors considered, when selecting individuals on the list for services, and requires the State Board of Education, in consultation with the Department, to inform parents and guardians of students about this consideration when informing them about the Prioritization of Urgency of Need for Services waiting list.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 30, 2016: HB6086 - Third Reading
May 10, 2016: HB6086 - Human Services
April 20, 2016: HB6086 - Third Reading
April 14, 2016: HFA0001 - Human Services
April 5, 2016: HB6086 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor