+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 060-055-000
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Filed
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 010-007-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Pension Note Filed
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Vote
May 15, 2014: HB6081 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 15, 2014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor