+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On December 1, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 015-000-000
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor