+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 060-056-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 013-009-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations to the Department of Healthcare and Family Services. Effective July 1, 2014.
+ − Vote
May 15, 2014: HB6070 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 15, 2014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor