+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0840
- Effective Date December 23, 2009
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 084-028-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lou Lang
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-003-001
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cullerton
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 036-020-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2009
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 28, 2009
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2009
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009
- Do Pass Commerce; 008-000-000
- Assigned to Commerce
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 18, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-012-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Provides that compensation paid to a private manager under a management agreement may include a fee for services and a performance-based bonus. Provides for other types of authorization from the federal Department of Justice than just a clarifying memorandum to allow the sale of lottery tickets on the Internet. Limits Internet sales of lottery tickets to transactions that are initiated and received exclusively within the State. Requires the Department of Revenue to submit a request to the United States Department of Justice for review of the State's plan to implement a pilot program for the sale of lottery tickets on the Internet and its propriety under federal law. Provides that the Department shall implement the Internet pilot program only if the Department of Justice does not object to the implementation of the program within a reasonable period of time after its review. Provides that the Governor (instead of the Department of Revenue) shall select (instead of enter into a management agreement with) a private manager by September 15, 2010 (instead of March 1, 2010). Makes changes in provisions allowing the Department's retention of advisors. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.