+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-052-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Michael J. Madigan
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 014-008-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 In line by 3PM. Timely filed in accordance with House Rule 18(e).
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Makes appropriations for the ordinary and contingent expenses of the Board of Trustees of Northeastern Illinois University for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2014, as follows: General Funds $37,893,400.
+ − Vote
May 15, 2014: HB6031 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 15, 2014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor