+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On July 29, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0683
- Effective Date July 29, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000
On May 30, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel and Pensions Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Deb Conroy
On May 29, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T. Cullerton
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- Judicial Note Filed
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that any information contained in the vital records shall be made available at no cost to any pension fund or retirement system under the Illinois Pension Code for administrative purposes.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Excludes pension funds established under the Downstate Police or Downstate Firefighter Articles of the Illinois Pension Code from the requirement of developing and implementing a process to identify annuitants who are deceased. Provides that the information contained in the vital records shall be made available at no cost to the pension fund or retirement system. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (7)
May 31, 2016: SFA0001 - Personnel & Pensions
May 31, 2016: SFA0001 - Concurrence
May 27, 2016: HB6030 - Third Reading
May 11, 2016: SFA0001 - Licensed Activities and Pensions
May 4, 2016: HB6030 - Licensed Activities and Pensions
April 14, 2016: HB6030 - Third Reading
April 6, 2016: HB6030 - Personnel & Pensions
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor