+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0903
- Sent to the Governor
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 103-005-000
- House Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Gillespie
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-009-000
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2022
- Rule 2-10(e) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ann Gillespie
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 19, 2021
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading August 31, 2021
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Postponed - Health
- Assigned to Health
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that commission of possession of burglary tools includes when a person, knowingly and with the intent to enter the motor vehicle and with the intent to commit therein a felony or theft, possesses a device designed to: (1) unlock or start a motor vehicle without the use or possession of the key to the motor vehicle; or (2) capture or duplicate a signal from the key fob of a motor vehicle to unlock or start the motor vehicle without the use or possession of the key to the motor vehicle.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that specified requirements also apply to opioid treatment programs that are licensed or certified by the Department of Human Services' Division of Substance Use Prevention and Recovery and are authorized by the federal Drug Enforcement Administration to prescribe Schedule II, III, IV, or V controlled substances for the treatment of opioid use disorders. Requires opioid treatment programs to attempt to obtain written patient consent, document attempts to obtain the written consent, and not transmit information without patient consent. Provides that the documentation obtained shall not be utilized for law enforcement purposes. Provides that treatment of a patient shall not be conditioned upon his or her written consent. Makes other changes.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 720 ILCS 570/316
- 720 ILCS 5/19-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 19-2