+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 22, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0249
- Effective Date July 22, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 13, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4 (a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4 (a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2003
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-003
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 5, 2002 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Amends the Emergency Medical Services Systems Act. Provides that in awarding funds to support disaster preparedness by first responders, the Illinois Department of Public Health and other State agencies shall take into account the role of hospitals in being prepared to respond to emergencies or disasters. Contains legislative findings regarding the role of hospitals as first responders.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 15 ILCS 30/1 - from Ch. 127, par. 293.1
- 20 ILCS 2310/2310-50.5 new -
- 20 ILCS 3305/4 - from Ch. 127, par. 1054
- 20 ILCS 3305/5 - from Ch. 127, par. 1055
- 20 ILCS 3305/9 - from Ch. 127, par. 1059
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2003: HB0006 - Third Reading - Friday, May 16, 2003
March 21, 2003: HB0006 - Third Reading - Friday, March 21, 2003
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor