+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-001-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 5, 2019: HB0006 - Health Care Availability & Access
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor