+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- To Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Provides a person is not in violation of the offense of injuring or killing an animal used by a law enforcement department or agency if the animal was used against the person in violation of the law enforcement department or agency's use of force continuum or policy. Provides the amendatory Act may be referred to as Draco's Law. Makes technical changes.
+ − Statute Amended
- 510 ILCS 70/4.04 - from Ch. 8, par. 704.04
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2016: HB5995 - Third Reading
April 18, 2016: HFA0001 - Judiciary - Criminal
April 6, 2016: HB5995 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor