+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (58)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0876
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 077-041-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 077-041-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Arrived in House
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 042-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Raoul
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016
- Second Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2016
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-031-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 006-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 006-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 006-004-000
- Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment 002
In provisions amending the Illinois Roofing Industry Licensing Act and the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985, makes corrections to references.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Funeral Directors and Embalmers Licensing Code, the Illinois Roofing Industry Licensing Act, and the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Provides that when reviewing a conviction, finding of guilt, jury verdict, or entry of judgment or by sentencing of an initial applicant for a license under the Acts, the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may only deny a license based upon consideration of specified mitigating factors for specified felonies directly related to the practice of funeral directing and embalming, roofing contracting, or cosmetology, esthetics, hair braiding, nail technology, or barbering. Provides that the Department shall issue an annual report by January 31, 2018 and January 31 each year thereafter indicating specific information on applicants within the preceding calendar year. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2017.
House Amendment 002
In provisions amending the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, removes references to the Illinois Public Accounting Act and the Real Estate License Act of 2000. Removes provisions amending the Illinois Public Accounting Act and the Real Estate License Act of 2000.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the introduced bill with the following changes: Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that with respect to licensees and applicants under specified occupational Acts, the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall include formal complaints, including a refusal to issue a potential licensee with a positive conviction history for professions covered by the license, in its publication of disciplinary actions. Provides that the publication of disciplinary actions shall include a summary of the number of potential licensees with a positive conviction history, the rate of refusal to issue licenses for all applicants with a positive conviction history, the average time elapsed since the latest conviction of potential licensees who were refused a license and of potential licensees with a positive conviction history who were issued a license, the number of potential licensees who had a Certificate of Relief from Disabilities, and the number of potential licensees with a Certificate of Relief from Disabilities who were refused a license. In provisions amending the Funeral Directors and Embalmers Licensing Code, makes changes concerning grounds for disciplinary actions. Provides that the Department shall not deny a license to a potential licensee whose conviction history is directly related to the profession for which a license is sought if the Department has not considered mitigating factors provided in the Act. Provides that when issuing a license, the Department may not consider a prior conviction or conviction alone as the sole basis for refusing to issue a license unless the crime for which he or she was convicted directly (rather than substantially and directly) relates to the occupation or which the license is sought. Removes a potential licensee that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services has previously determined is more than 30 days delinquent in the payment of child support as an individual the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may refuse to renew or may revoke or suspend that person's license or may take other disciplinary action against that person based solely upon the certification of delinquency made by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may not refuse to issue a license to a potential licensee who is an obligor because the obligor's child support arrearage equals or exceeds the amount of child support payable for 12 (rather than 6) months. Makes similar changes for licenses issued under the Illinois Roofing Industry Licensing Act, the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985, the Illinois Public Accounting Act, and the Real Estate License Act of 2000. Makes other changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 225 ILCS 41/15-75 -
- 225 ILCS 335/9.1 - from Ch. 111, par. 7509.1
- 225 ILCS 410/4-7 - from Ch. 111, par. 1704-7
- 225 ILCS 450/20.01 - from Ch. 111, par. 5521.01
- 225 ILCS 454/20-20 -
- 20 ILCS 2105/2105-205 - was 20 ILCS 2105/60.3
- 225 ILCS 41/15-72 new -
- 225 ILCS 410/4-6.1 new -
- 225 ILCS 335/7.1 new -