+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 21, 2010 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1156
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 21, 2010
On May 28, 2010 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2010
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010
- Do Pass Local Government; 005-000-000
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 18, 2010
- Arrive in Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Cities & Villages Committee
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kay Hatcher
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Illinois Municipal Code. In provisions concerning the number of aldermen for specified municipalities, provides that the number of aldermen shall be determined using the most recent federal decennial census results.
+ − Statute Amended
- 65 ILCS 5/3.1-20-10 - from Ch. 24, par. 3.1-20-10
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2010: HB5970 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 29, 2010
March 17, 2010: HB5970 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 17, 2010
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor